U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ASKINS, ET. AL.,
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • March 31, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.