U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00383-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PENA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.