U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HONG-LONG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.