U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00121-2
  • Case Name: USA v. GREENE, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Order of Probation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.