U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HARDING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.