U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00254-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SLADE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
  • April 09, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Revoking Bond]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.