U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STAFFORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of US Passport]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.