U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00396-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Defender Association]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript - PDF]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.