U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BONAPARTE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order for Writ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.