U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SADRISLAMOV
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order re Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.