U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WARREN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.