U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RIOS-ANDASOL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [MAG Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Warrant ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.