U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00451-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HALL, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.