U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOSA SALGUERO, ET. AL.,
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.