U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BASS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.