U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01978
  • Case Name: JOHNSON v. PHILADELPHIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice Re: Magistrate Consent]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.