U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-21001
  • Case Name: Chauncy James Christner and Rheanna Lee Christner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Voluntary Petition]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Attach Wages - PAWB Form 11]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Petition Completed]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.