U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10213
  • Case Name: Ronald Michael Viglione
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Amended Schedules A B C G H I J]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Corrective Entry]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Schedule C]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Corrective Entry]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Summary of Schedules]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form B 122A-1]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Statement of Intent]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Schedules A-J]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Employee Income Records]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spero, Joseph B. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.