U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-70144
  • Case Name: Ashley M. Edmiston
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.