U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11522-djb
  • Case Name: Robert Dale Burford
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WEST, KENNETH E. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WEST, KENNETH E. [Extend / Shorten Time]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WEST, KENNETH E. [Extend / Shorten Time]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WEST, KENNETH E. [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WEST, KENNETH E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WEST, KENNETH E. [Matrix List of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WEST, KENNETH E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Requiring Documents]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.