open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:11-cv-00023
    Party Name:Emhart Industries, Inc. v. United States Department of the Air Force et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Transcript Request]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Order Acknowledgment (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Record]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Joinder]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Docket Entry]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Fourth Party Complaint]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Crossclaim]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Third Party Complaint]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Memorandum]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Notice]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit/Witness List]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Post Trial Brief]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Decree]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Held]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?29844
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =