open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:13-cr-00111-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rheau et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Transcript Order Without Payment of Fee]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Transcript Fees]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Acknowledgment (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit in Support]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Other]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Returning Document]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibits Returned]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Three Level Decrease]
    Date Published:September 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:May 27, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?35699
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =