open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:13-cv-00131
    Party Name:The City of Providence v. Buck Consultants, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Intervene]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Intervene]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:August 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:August 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?34408
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =