open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:07-cr-00143-1
    Party Name:USA v. Tatro
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ Hearing]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Permanently Assigned]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Conditionally Assigned]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment & Instructions]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:July 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?37003
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =