U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Palmisano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Final Order -Transfer Out Probation or Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Probation 12-B Request for Modification w/Consent]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Probation 12-B Request for Modification w/Consent]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • March 06, 2017: [Produce]
  • March 01, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 12, 2016: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Status Report ]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [In Chambers Conference]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [USCA Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [Vacate (2255)]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 19, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 17, 2015: [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
  • August 17, 2015: [CJA 24 -Transcript Request Approved]
  • August 14, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2015: [CJA 24 Request for Transcript]
  • August 06, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2015: [Three Level Decrease]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Three Level Decrease]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • August 05, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2014
  • October 27, 2014: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.