U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Torres et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Reducing Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • January 25, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • January 25, 2019: [Stipulation Reducing Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • January 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender (Form Attached)]
  • January 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 09, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - 2014 USSC Amendment]
  • March 16, 2016: [Memorandum and Order]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order 2014 USSC Sentence Reduction]
  • January 04, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - 2014 USSC Amendment]
October, 2014
  • October 28, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - 2014 USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.