U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bartlett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 01, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • September 01, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 07, 2015: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
October, 2014
  • October 28, 2014: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.