U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferrara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Probation 12-B Request for Modification w/Consent]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Probation 12-B Request for Modification w/Consent]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Three Level Decrease]
  • July 15, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 15, 2015: [Three Level Decrease]
  • July 08, 2015: [Exhibit in Support]
  • July 06, 2015: [Sentence Variation]
March, 2015
  • March 24, 2015: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.