U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fortes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 08, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2020: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment (Form Attached)]
  • June 03, 2020: [Transcript Order]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Transcript]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Letters of Character]
  • October 29, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 22, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2015
  • September 12, 2015: [Sentence Variation]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 03, 2015: [Continue]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 29, 2015: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Trial Notice]
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 30, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 29, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 19, 2015: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
March, 2015
  • March 25, 2015: [Arraignment Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.