U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chandler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • December 21, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 21, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 04, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 04, 2015: [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order Reducing Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
March, 2015
  • March 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order 2014 USSC Sentence Reduction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.