U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greene
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2021: [Hearing Cancelled]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender (Form Attached)]
  • December 21, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • December 14, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Probation 12-B Request for Modification w/Consent]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order Reducing Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • January 29, 2019: [Stipulation Reducing Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • January 28, 2019: [Stipulation Reducing Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • January 28, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
  • January 18, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender (Form Attached)]
  • January 17, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.