U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:01-mc-09004
  • Case Name: Naturalization
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Naturalization Ceremony]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Naturalization Ceremony]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: [Naturalization Ceremony]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Naturalization Ceremony]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Naturalization Ceremony]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Naturalization Ceremony]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Naturalization Ceremony]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Naturalization Ceremony]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • December 10, 2021: [Naturalization Ceremony]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Naturalization Ceremony]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Naturalization Ceremony]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Naturalization Ceremony]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Naturalization Ceremony]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Naturalization Ceremony]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Naturalization Ceremony]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Naturalization Ceremony]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Naturalization Ceremony]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • October 02, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • June 03, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • May 09, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Naturalization Ceremony]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • November 08, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • August 15, 2018: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • August 06, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Public Docket Note]
  • April 05, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Naturalization Ceremony]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • September 22, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • August 08, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • June 05, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 06, 2017: [Naturalization Ceremony]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • July 06, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Hearing Cancelled]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • February 09, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • February 08, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • February 05, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • February 04, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • February 03, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • February 02, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • February 01, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • January 28, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • January 26, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • January 25, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • January 22, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • January 21, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • January 20, 2016: [Naturalization Ceremony]
  • January 19, 2016: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.