U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Slagel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 12, 2017: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Transcript Order]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Three Level Decrease]
  • February 10, 2017: [Three Level Decrease]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 08, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continue]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2016: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 05, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
  • March 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 29, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.