open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00014
    Party Name:United States of America v. Real Property Located at 150 Scituate Avenue in Cranston, Rhode Island
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Writ]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45785
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =