Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:10-bk-13939
    Party Name:James M. Abbott and Kimberly J. Abbott
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Defer Filing Fee]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Update Objection/Response Deadline]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Application to Defer Filing Fee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?91923
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =