open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:07-cr-00003-1
    Party Name:USA v. Pierre
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation Reducing Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reducing Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?21894
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =