open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10192
    Party Name:Sean J. Gannon
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Court Notice]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Transcript Filed]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Transcript Filed]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Default of Appeal Deadline]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Acknowledgement of Transcript Request]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Corrective Action Taken (TEXT ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Related Documents Pursuant to 8003/8004]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Request for Transcript]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Discharging Debtor (Autodisch)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Response]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Requesting Status Report]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Meeting Continued]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Update Objection/Response Deadline]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Update Other Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Set (RFS)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Relief from Stay (fee)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118252
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =