Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00060
    Party Name:Diamonte v. Town of Coventry,et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45917
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =