open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10193
    Party Name:Gerson O. Santa Cruz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Corrective Action Required]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Notice of Rule 3004 Claim]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Withdrawal of Claim (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Terminate Document]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Regarding Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Response]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Meeting Continued]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Agreement - LF 2083-1.1]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118253
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =