Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10399
    Party Name:Kevin T Brady
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Notice to the Court]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Affidavit]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Agreement - LF 2083-1.1]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118462
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =