open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10589
    Party Name:Michael A. Pate
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Discharging Ch. 7 Trustee & Closing No Asset Case]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Terminate Document]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Service of Document]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Update Other Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Creditor List Upload (original list of creditors)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Duplicate Filer]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Pro Se Debtor]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Add Judge (this is not Private Entry)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118657
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =