open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10593
    Party Name:Karen M Keevers
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Avoid Lien (for Chs. 7, 11 and 12 only)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Initial Financial Management Notice]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118661
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =