open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00277
    Party Name:Gillooly v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Sever]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sever]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?46688
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =