open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10793
    Party Name:Sheila G. Harris
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Discharging Debtor (Autodisch)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Added Creditor Deadline(s)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118867
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =