open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00321
    Party Name:Melody V. v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Consenting to Magistrate Judge - Random Assignment(Form Attached)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Assignment of U.S. Magistrate Judge - Random]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Administrative Record]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?46945
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =