open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10946
    Party Name:Ana J. Montalban
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Extend Time (523/727)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Initial Financial Management Notice]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Hearing Set (RFS)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Relief from Stay (fee)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - case upload]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - case upload]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119023
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =