open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10945
    Party Name:Phyliss Elaine Hicks
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Initial Financial Management Notice]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Objection]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Terminate Document]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Expedited Determination]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Relief from Stay (fee)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Corrective Action Required]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-1 Statement of Your Monthly Income (means test)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Document]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Update Other Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Duplicate Filer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Add Judge (this is not Private Entry)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Certificate of Pro Se Debtor]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-2 Means Test Calculation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geremia, Lisa A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119022
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =