open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11302
    Party Name:Christopher D. Blouin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Confirmation Hearing Set]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Initial Financial Management Notice]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Added Creditor Deadline(s)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Amended Schedules and Statements]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Form 122C-1 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Missing Document(s) Filed]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Chapter 13 Agreement - LF 2083-1.1]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Amended List of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Update Other Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Extend Time]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Boyajian, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119386
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =