open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-bk-11301
    Party Name:Pedro J. Rego, Sr. and Kimberley A. Rego
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Debtor (Autodisch)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rib.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?119385
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =