open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00433
    Party Name:Gavel v. The One, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47296
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =